Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990005

EP0990005 - ETHYLENE-ALPHA-OLEFIN POLYMERS, PROCESSES AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pennzoil Quaker State Company
700 Milam Street
Houston, TX 77002 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / HEILMAN, William
14826 La Quinta Lane
Houston, TX 77079 / US
02 / I-CHING, Chiu
9708 West Airport Boulevard
Houston, TX 77031 / US
03 / CHIEN, James, C., W.
Amherst Polymer Technology, Inc., 15 Coach Lane
Amherst, MA 01002 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Zeestraten, Albertus W. J.
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/03]Zeestraten, Albertus Wilhelmus Joannes
Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
Former [2000/14]Winkler, Andreas, Dr.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98930331.822.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US12621
Priority number, dateUS1997088015120.06.1997         Original published format: US 880151
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858972
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990005
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990005
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08F210/16, C08F8/00, C10M107/02, C10M171/04
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:COPOLYMERE AUS ETHYLEN UND ALPHA-OLEFINEN,VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2000/14]
English:ETHYLENE-ALPHA-OLEFIN POLYMERS, PROCESSES AND USES[2000/14]
French:POLYMERES D'ETHYLENE-ALPHA-OLEFINE, LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2000National basic fee paid 
11.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
27.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2004Fee for grant paid
10.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04100327.8  / EP1426388
EP04100329.4  / EP1428842
EP04100330.2  / EP1426389
Opposition(s)09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
IT08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
PT08.05.2005
CY22.06.2005
IE22.06.2005
LU22.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/26]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
CY22.06.2005
IE22.06.2005
LU22.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2007/21]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
CY22.06.2005
IE22.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2007/17]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
IE22.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2006/28]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
IE22.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2006/25]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
IE22.06.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
NL08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
ES19.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT08.12.2004
CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
GR08.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH08.12.2004
FI08.12.2004
LI08.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI08.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US5276227  (WU MARGARET M [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 47 - line 57 * * column 4, line 19 - line 31; claims 1-21 *;
 [X]EP0021634  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-15,54 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 2; claims 1-10 *;
 [DY]EP0200351  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [DY] 1-97 * page 8, line 11 - page 11, line 27 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 9 * * page 14, line 16 - page 15, line 13 * * page 19, line 29 - page 20, line 17; claims 1-18 *;
 [Y]WO9533781  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-97 * page 7, line 15 - line 22 * * page 11, line 1 - line 17 * * page 19, line 27 - page 20, line 8 * * page 20, line 35 - page 22, line 28 * * page 24, line 1 - line 7 * * page 30, line 27 - page 31, line 16; claims 1-21 *;
 [Y]US3676521  (STEARNS RICHARD S, et al) [Y] 1-97 * column 1, line 18 - line 32 * * column 5, line 70 - column 6, line 23; claims 1-6 *;
 [Y]FR1492025  (PITTSBURGH PLATE GLASS CO) [Y] 1-97 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 5, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 6, column 1, paragraph 1; claims 1-32 *;
 [A]EP0620264  (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1,16,37,43,54 * page 2, line 35 - line 38; claims 1-17 *;
 [A]DE1939037  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 1,54 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 8; claims 1-15 *;
 [A]US4413156  (WATTS JR LEWIS W [US], et al) [A] 1,37,43,54 * claims 1-17 *;
 [A]EP0332243  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1,43 * column 5, line 45 - column 7, line 5; figure 1; claims 1-14 *;
 [A]GB1525599  (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO) [A] 1 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 14; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]WO8703610  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-66 *;
 [A]GB1033456  (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [A] 1 * claims 1-22 *;
 [A]US5296515  (JOHNSON MARVIN M [US], et al) [A] 1,16,37 * claims 1-8 *