Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990087

EP0990087 - CALLIOPE OIL PRODUCTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reitz, Donald D.
7484 East Cedar Avenue Denver
Colorado 80230 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Reitz, Donald D.
8665 Lamar Drive
Arvada, CO 80003 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Schmitz, Jean-Marie , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date98930350.817.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US12660
Priority number, dateUS1997088001120.06.1997         Original published format: US 880011
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859152
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990087
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:E21B43/12
[2002/01]
Former International [2000/14]E21B43/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:FÖRDERANLAGE FÜR ÖL VOM TYP CALLIOPE[2000/14]
English:CALLIOPE OIL PRODUCTION SYSTEM[2000/14]
French:SYSTEME DE PRODUCTION DE PETROLE DE TYPE "CALLIOPE"[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2000National basic fee paid 
18.01.2000Search fee paid 
18.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
04.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/42]
18.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5006046  (BUCKMAN WILLIAM G [US], et al);
 [X]US1853269  (HARRIS FORD W);
 [X]US3941510  (MORGAN THOMAS H);
 [X]US5211242  (COLEMAN MALCOLM W [US], et al);
 [X]US4711306  (BOBO ROY A [US])
by applicantUS3941510
 US3991825
 US4923372
 US3884299
 US3894583