Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016327

EP1016327 - EMISSIVE DISPLAY USING ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DIODES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FED CORPORATION
1580 Route 52, Hudson Valley Research Park
Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
FED CORPORATION
1580 Route 52, Hudson Valley Research Park
Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Gary, W.
8 Taconic View Court
Lagrangeville, NY 12540 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98930369.818.06.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US12694
Priority number, dateUS19970050459P23.06.1997         Original published format: US 50459 P
US1998007442408.05.1998         Original published format: US 74424
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859528
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016327
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search reportUS30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/02, H05B33/14, H05B33/22, H01J1/62, H01J63/04, H01L33/00, H01L35/24, H01L51/00
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/27]
TitleGerman:EMISSIONSANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ORGANISCHEN ELEKTROLUMINESZENTEN DIODEN[2000/27]
English:EMISSIVE DISPLAY USING ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DIODES[2000/27]
French:VISUEL EMISSIF DANS LEQUEL ON UTILISE DES DIODES ORGANIQUES ELECTROLUMINESCENTES[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2000National basic fee paid 
20.01.2000Search fee paid 
20.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
31.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/32]
25.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5003221  (SHIMIZU YASUMOTO [JP]);
 [A]US5457565  (NAMIKI TOHRU [JP], et al);
 [A]US5525867  (WILLIAMS RONALD L [US]);
 [A]US5189405  (YAMASHITA TAKUO [JP], et al)