Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998281

EP0998281 - KAPPA AGONIST COMPOUNDS, PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS AND METHOD OF PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF PRURITUS THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2007  [2007/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adolor Corporation
371 Phoenixville Pike
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
[2000/19]
Inventor(s)01 / KRUSE, Lawrence, I.
646 Clinton Avenue
Haddonfield, NJ 08033-0117 / US
02 / CHANG, An-Chih
A178 Westridge Gardens
Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US
03 / DEHAVEN-HUDKINS, Diane, L.
430 South Saddlebrook Circle
Chester Springs, PA 19460 / US
04 / FARRAR, John, J.
1066 Bodine Road
Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US
05 / GAUL, Forrest
1787 Fairview Road
Glen Moore, PA 19343 / US
06 / KUMAR, Virendra
14 Lynne Circle
Paoli, PA 19301 / US
07 / MARELLA, Michael Anthony
32 Carriage Lane
Exton, PA 19341 / US
08 / MAYCOCK, Alan, L.
1908 Standiford Drive
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
09 / ZHANG, Wei, Yuan
154 Hunsicker Drive
Collegeville, PA 19426 / US
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Straus, Alexander , et al
Patentanwälte
Becker, Kurig, Straus
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Straus, Alexander, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date98930400.119.06.1998
[2000/19]
WO1998US12769
Priority number, dateUS1997089183314.07.1997         Original published format: US 891833
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903468
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998281
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/40, A61K31/495
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/19]
TitleGerman:KAPPA REZEPTORENANTAGONISTEN, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMMENSTELLUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR PROPHYLAXE UND BEHANDLUNG DES PRURITUS MIT DIESEN VERBINDUNGEN[2000/19]
English:KAPPA AGONIST COMPOUNDS, PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS AND METHOD OF PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF PRURITUS THEREWITH[2000/19]
French:COMPOSES AGONISTES DES RECEPTEURS KAPPA, COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET METHODE DE PREVENTION ET DE TRAITEMENT DU PRURIT A L'AIDE DESDITS COMPOSES[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase03.12.1999National basic fee paid 
03.12.1999Search fee paid 
03.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/19]
03.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/31]
20.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AP]US5804595  (PORTOGHESE PHILIP S [US], et al)