Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990174

EP0990174 - HIGH RESOLUTION DETERMINATION OF SEISMIC POLAR ANISOTROPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BP Corporation North America Inc.
Mail Code 5 East 4101 Winfield Road
Warrenville, IL 60555 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/46]For all designated states
BP Corporation North America Inc.
Mail Code 5 East 4101 Winfield Road
Warrenville, IL 60555 / US
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
BP Corporation North America Inc.
200 East Randolph Drive MC 2207A
Chicago, IL 60601 / US
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
BP Amoco Corporation
Mail Code 1907A, P.O. Box 87703, 200 East Randolph Drive
Chicago, IL 60680-0703 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THOMSEN, Leon, A.
12707 Melvern Court
Houston, TX 77041 / US
02 / DELLINGER, Joseph, A.
7715 South Yale 1202
Tulsa, OK 74136 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98930426.618.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US12866
Priority number, dateUS19970050389P20.06.1997         Original published format: US 50389 P
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859264
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990174
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990174
Date:17.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01V1/48
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/14]
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG VON SEISMISCHER POLARER ANISOTROPIE MIT HOHER AUFLÖSUNG[2002/46]
English:HIGH RESOLUTION DETERMINATION OF SEISMIC POLAR ANISOTROPY[2000/14]
French:MESURE HAUTE RESOLUTION DE L'ANISOTROPIE POLAIRE SISMIQUE[2000/14]
Former [2000/14]BESTIMMUNG VON SEISMISCHER POLARE ANISOTROPIE MIT HOHER AUFLÖSUNG
Entry into regional phase24.12.1999National basic fee paid 
24.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.12.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
24.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2004Fee for grant paid
14.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200104   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT17.11.2004
[2008/16]
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0296987  (SCHLUMBERGER LTD ;SCHLUMBERGER PROSPECTION (FR)) [X] 22 * abstract * * page 2, column R, line 33 - page 3, column L, line 14 * * page 4, column L, line 46 - page 5, column R, line 15 * * page 7, column L, line 21 - line 27 * [Y] 1-9,13-21,23,28-40;
 [A]US4907206  (RAI CHANDRA S ET AL) [A] 1,20-22,30,31 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 41 *;
 [XA]RU1778726
 [XA]  - ALKHALIFAH T AND TSVANKIN I, "velocity analysis for transversely isotropic media", GEOPHYSICS, SEPT-OCT. 1995, SOC. EXPLORATION GEOPHYSICISTS, USA, vol. 60, no. 5, pages 1550 - 1566, XP002082651 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 1561 * ** discussion and conclusions ** ** appendix b ** [A] 20-22,30,31

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1443888
 [DYA]  - THOMSEN L, "Weak elastic anisotropy", GEOPHYSICS, OCT. 1986, USA, ISSN 0016-8033, vol. 51, no. 10, pages 1954 - 1966, XP002082613 [DY] 1-9,13-21,23,28-40 * the whole document * ** formula 16... **;; figures 1-5 * [A] 21,24,25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1442051
    [ ] - GAVIN PH ET AL, "traitement des diagraphies acoustiques deuieme partie* separation des ondes en diagraphie acoustique", REVUE DE L'INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, (19920301), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 155 - 178, XP000261199 [ ] * figures 1,2 *
 [XA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 49, Database accession no. 93-394377, XP002082614 & SU1778726 A 19921130 (UKR GEOPROSP RES INST KIEV GEOPHYS DIV) [X] 22 * abstract * [A] 1-9,13,14,20,21,26-31