EP0998574 - METHODS OF PERFORMING HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION BASED MODIFICATION OF NUCLEIC ACIDS IN RECOMBINATION DEFICIENT CELLS AND USE OF THE MODIFIED NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY 1230 York Avenue New York New York 10021-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states THE ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY 1230 York Avenue New York New York 10021-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINTZ, Nathaniel 441 Fowler Avenue Pelham Manor, NY 10803 / US | 02 /
MODEL, Peter 500 East 63rd Street New York, NY 10021 / US | 03 /
YANG, Xiangdong, W. 1230 York Avenue,Box 339 New York, NY 10021 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belmont House, 20 Wood Lane Leeds LS6 2AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930459.7 | 23.06.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998US12966 | Priority number, date | US19970880966 | 23.06.1997 Original published format: US 880966 | US19980102490 | 22.06.1998 Original published format: US 102490 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859060 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998574 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/70, C12N15/90, A01K67/027 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP);
C12N15/70 (EP);
C12N15/902 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
C12N2800/202 (EP);
C12N2800/204 (EP);
C12N2840/203 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Extension states | AL | 24.01.2000 | LT | 24.01.2000 | LV | 24.01.2000 | MK | 24.01.2000 | RO | 24.01.2000 | SI | 24.01.2000 | Title | German: | METHODEN FÜR DIE AUSFÜHRUNG VON HOMOLOGER REKOMBINATION ZUR MODIFIKATION VON NUKLEINSÄUREN IN REKOMBINATIONSDEFIZIENTEN ZELLEN UND DIE VERWENDUNG DER MODIFIZIERTEN NUKLEINSÄUREN | [2000/19] | English: | METHODS OF PERFORMING HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION BASED MODIFICATION OF NUCLEIC ACIDS IN RECOMBINATION DEFICIENT CELLS AND USE OF THE MODIFIED NUCLEIC ACIDS | [2000/19] | French: | PROCEDES DE PREFORMAGE DE RECOMBINAISON HOMOLOGUE D'APRES UNE MODIFICATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES DANS DES CELLULES PRESENTANT UNE DEFICIENCE DE RECOMBINAISON, ET UTILISATION DES PRODUITS D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES MODIFIES DE CELLES-CI | [2000/19] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/51] | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA] - O'CONNOR M. ET AL., "Construction of large DNA segments in Escherichia coli.", SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1307 - 1312, XP002081196 [DA] 1-44 * see the whole document, especially Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2660262 | [DA] - MONACO A. P. ET AL, "YACS, BACS, PACS AND MACS: ARTIFICIAL CHROMOSOMES AS RESEARCH TOOLS", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199407), vol. 17, no. 7, pages 280 - 286, XP000601472 [DA] 1-44 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(94)90140-6 | [AD] - KIM U.-J. ET AL., "Construction and characterization of a human bacterial artificial chromosome library.", GENOMICS, (1996), vol. 34, pages 213 - 218, XP002081197 [AD] 1-44 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1996.0268 | [A] - KÜHN R. ET AL., "Inducible gene targeting in mice.", SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 269, pages 1427 - 1429, XP002081198 [A] 1-44 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7660125 | [DA] - CHATTERJEE P. K. AND COHEN J. S., "Isolating large nested deletions in bacterial and P1 artificial chromosomes by in vivo P1 packaging of products of Cre-catalysed recombination between the endogenous and a transposed loxP site.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19970601), vol. 25, no. 11, pages 2205 - 2212, XP002081566 [DA] 1-44 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.11.2205 | [A] - LARIONOV V. ET AL., "RECOMBINATION DURING TRANSFORMATION AS A SOURCE OF CHIMERIC MAMMALIAN ARTIFICIAL CHROMOSOMES IN YEAST (YACS)", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, no. 20, pages 4154 - 4161, XP002027292 [A] 1-44 * column W * | [A] - EGGLESTON A. K. AND WEST S. C., "Exchanging partners: recombination in E. coli.", TRENDS IN GENETICS, (1996), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 20 - 25, XP002081199 [A] 1-34,40-44 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-9525(96)81384-9 | [DA] - BAKER A. AND COTTEN M., "Delivery of bacterial artificial chromosomes into mammalian cels with psoralen-inactivated adenovirus carrier.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19970525), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 1950 - 1956, XP002081200 [DA] 35-39 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.10.1950 | [PX] - YANG X. W. ET AL., "Homologous recombination based modification in Escherichia coli and germline transmission in transgenic mice of a bacterial artificial chromosome.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199709), vol. 15, pages 859 - 865, XP002081201 [PX] 1-44 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0997-859 | [T] - SIMON M. I., "Dysfunctional genomics: BACs to the rescue.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199709), vol. 15, page 839, XP002081202 [T] 1-44 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0997-839 |