Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990212

EP0990212 - A METHOD FOR LAYING OUT A PARAGRAPH USING A LAYOUT SERVICES LIBRARY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.03.2002  [2002/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Microsoft
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BALLARD, Dean, D.
11932 Exeter Avenue, N.E.
Seattle, WA 98125 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)McCarthy, Denis Alexis , et al
MacLachlan & Donaldson
Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road
Citywest Business Campus
Dublin D24 C56E / IE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]McCarthy, Denis Alexis , et al
MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date98930489.426.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US13131
Priority number, dateUS1997088366627.06.1997         Original published format: US 883666
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900748
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990212
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/21
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM GESTALTEN EINES PARAGRAPHEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER BIBLIOTHEK VON GESTALTUNGSDIENSTEN[2000/14]
English:A METHOD FOR LAYING OUT A PARAGRAPH USING A LAYOUT SERVICES LIBRARY[2000/14]
French:PROCEDE DE MISE EN FORME DE PARAGRAPHE FAISANT APPEL A UNE BIBLIOTHEQUE DE SERVICES DE MISE EN FORME[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2000National basic fee paid 
26.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
14.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/12]
11.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0313399  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 7,10,13,17,18;
 [A]US5440745  (PLATTE BRIAN G [US], et al) [A] 13,17,18 * abstract * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 45 *;
 [A]US5416898  (OPSTAD DAVID G [US], et al) [A] 1,7,10,13,17,18 * abstract * * column 5, line 61 - column 14, line 40; figures 1-17 *