blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0993685 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0993685



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 279
24.09.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
25.06.2008 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.07.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.05.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.05.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
14.05.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.05.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 5
19.04.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.04.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
12.01.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.01.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.01.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
28.11.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
30.10.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.10.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
25.10.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
25.10.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.10.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.10.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.10.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.10.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.10.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
14.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
14.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
14.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.07.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 6
30.06.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.06.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 6
01.05.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.04.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.04.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
11.04.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.04.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
31.03.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
01.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.07.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
29.07.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.04.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
07.11.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
03.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.04.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.12.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.12.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.10.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
07.08.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
02.05.2001 Decision to allow the request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
14.04.2001 Annex Search / examination 10
14.04.2001 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 8
03.04.2001 Annex Search / examination 3
03.04.2001 Annex Search / examination 2
03.04.2001 Annex Search / examination 1
03.04.2001 Annex Search / examination 2
03.04.2001 Annex Search / examination 1
03.04.2001 Annex Search / examination 1
03.04.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 7
03.04.2001 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
29.03.2001 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 18
05.03.2001 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.03.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
27.02.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.09.2000 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 3
01.08.2000 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.03.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.12.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
20.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.10.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 9
16.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 34
23.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30