blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993685


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2012  [2012/40]
25.09.2009 Change - representative published on  28.10.2009  [2009/44]
27.06.2008 No opposition filed within time limit published on  30.07.2008  [2008/31]
14.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
20.07.2007 (Expected) grant published on  22.08.2007  [2007/34]
06.07.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.04.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
10.01.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.01.2007 Change - classification published on  07.02.2007  [2007/06]
05.01.2007 Change - classification published on  07.02.2007  [2007/06]
05.01.2007 Change - German title published on  07.02.2007  [2007/06]
08.12.2006 Change - representative published on  10.01.2007  [2007/02]
21.10.2006 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.07.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.06.2006 Change - representative published on  02.08.2006  [2006/31]
06.04.2006 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.05.2003 Examination report or reply
16.04.2003 Renewal fee
27.12.2002 First examination report
18.12.2002 Examination report or reply
25.06.2002 Renewal fee
02.10.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
25.09.2001 Renewal fee
02.08.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
25.04.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
25.04.2001 Renewal fee
26.02.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
23.02.2001 Change - representative published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
15.02.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
27.07.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
28.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
01.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication