blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993685
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4384731BGlobal Dossier 16.12.2009B2
JP2002507328 05.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US9813443 24.06.1998
US88386097 27.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993685Global Dossier 22.08.2007B1
EP0993685 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9813443 24.06.1998
US88386097 27.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69838292T 15.05.2008T2
DE69838292D 04.10.2007D1
Priority number Date
US9813443 24.06.1998
US88386097 27.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL133722 29.05.2003A
IL133722D 30.04.2001D0
Priority number Date
US9813443 24.06.1998
US88386097 27.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100542665B 12.01.2006B1
KR20010014077 26.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US9813443 24.06.1998
US88386097 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9900832Global Dossier 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
US88386097 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT371264T 15.09.2007T
Priority number Date
US88386097 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW447038B 21.07.2001B
Priority number Date
US88386097 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6087266 11.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US88386097 27.06.1997