blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0993685

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 22.08.2007
 DE 
 FRLapse: 18.04.2008
 GB 
 IE 
 IT 
 NLLapse: 22.08.2007
Examination procedure17.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase14.01.2000National basic fee paid 
14.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200003   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2000
European patent granted22.08.2007
Opposition procedure26.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit published on 30.07.2008 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT DE FR GB IE IT NL
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000114
 
Event date:05.02.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20021223
 
Event date:07.02.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 21/3213 20060101AFI20070103BHEP
 
Event date:07.02.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 21/66 20060101ALI20070103BHEP
 
Event date:07.02.2007 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:METHOD FOR IMPROVING MICROLOADING WHILE ETCHING A SUBSTRATE
 
Event date:22.08.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT DE FR GB IE IT NL
 
Event date:22.08.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:19.09.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:04.10.2007 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69838292
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20071004
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:31.01.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070822
 
Event date:01.02.2008 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT
 
Event date:29.02.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070822
 
Event date:18.04.2008 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED
 
Event date:30.07.2008 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20080526
 
Event date:25.02.2009 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20080624
 
Event date:30.04.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080624
 
Event date:30.06.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080624
 
Event date:30.11.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20090629
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:28.02.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080630
 
Event date:29.04.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110101
 
Event date:31.08.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080418