Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993685

EP0993685 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING MICROLOADING WHILE ETCHING A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING MICROLOADING WHILE ETCHING A SUBSTRATE
[2007/06]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.06.2008
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 03.10.2012  [2012/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION
4650 Cushing Parkway
Fremont, CA 94538-6470 / US
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ABRAHAM, Susan, C.
894 Cape Diamond Drive
San Jose, CA 95133 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Hepworth Browne
15 St Paul's Street
Leeds LS1 2JG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade
Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB
Former [2007/02]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne 5 South Parade
Leeds, LS1 5QX / GB
Former [2006/31]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
HLBBshaw 1200 Century Way Thorpe Park Business Park, Colton
Leeds LS15 8ZA / GB
Former [2001/15]Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr.
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB
Former [2000/16]Browne, Robin Forsythe
Legal Department Patents Imperial Chemical Industries PLC PO Box 6 Bessemer Road
Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB
Application number, filing date98930516.424.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998US13443
Priority number, dateUS1997088386027.06.1997         Original published format: US 883860
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900832
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993685
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993685
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/3213, H01L21/66
[2007/06]
Former International [2000/16]H01L21/3213
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES MIKROLOADING EFFEKTS BEIM SUBSTRATÄTZEN[2007/06]
English:METHOD FOR IMPROVING MICROLOADING WHILE ETCHING A SUBSTRATE[2007/06]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LA MICROCHARGE AU COURS DE LA GRAVURE D'UN SUBSTRAT[2007/06]
Former [2000/16]EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES MIKROLOADING EFFEKTS BEIM SUBSTRATÄTZEN
Former [2000/16]METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING MICROLOADING WHILE ETCHING A SUBSTRATE
Former [2000/16]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LA MICROCHARGE AU COURS DE LA GRAVURE D'UN SUBSTRAT
Entry into regional phase14.01.2000National basic fee paid 
14.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
01.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
23.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
25.10.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2007Fee for grant paid
17.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200003   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
FR18.04.2008
[2012/40]
Former [2008/16]AT22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0702391  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,9,17 * abstract *;
 [PX]EP0788147  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [PX] 1,9,17 * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 12 *
 [A]  - CARTER J B ET AL, "TRANSFORMER COUPLED PLASMA ETCH TECHNOLOGY FOR THE FABRICATION OF SUBHALF MICRON STRUCTURES", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A, (19930701), vol. 11, no. 4, PART 01, pages 1301 - 1306, XP000403733 [A] 1,9,17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.578543