Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1023620

EP1023620 - NARROW TRANSMISSION BANDPASS FILTERS UTILISING BRAGG GRATING ASSISTED MODE CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY
Parramatta Road
Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY
Parramatta Road
Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / CANNING, John
35 Queen Street
Newtown, NSW 2006 / AU
02 / POLADIAN, Leon
4/11 Charlton Way
Glebe, NSW 2037 / AU
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date98930531.322.06.1998
[2000/31]
WO1998AU00477
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0761427.06.1997         Original published format: AU PO761497
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900683
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1023620
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/31]
Search report(s)International search reportAU07.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP12.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/10, G02B6/14, G02B6/18, G02B6/26, G02B5/20
[2000/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/31]
TitleGerman:SCHMALBANDIGE BANDPASSFILTER UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BRAGG-GITTER UNTERSTUTETER MODENKONVERSION[2000/31]
English:NARROW TRANSMISSION BANDPASS FILTERS UTILISING BRAGG GRATING ASSISTED MODE CONVERSION[2000/31]
French:FILTRES A TRANSMISSION EN BANDE ETROITE DE TYPE PASSE-BANDE UTILISANT UNE CONVERSION DE MODE S'ARTICULANT AUTOUR D'UN RESEAU DE BRAGG[2000/31]
Entry into regional phase16.12.1999National basic fee paid 
16.12.1999Search fee paid 
16.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
16.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/31]
26.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
30.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/24]
01.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/24]
02.02.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2006
02.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.02.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5420948  (BYRON KEVIN C [GB]) [A] 1,2,5-8,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0383627  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,6-9 * the whole document *
International search[XP]US5764831  (LAUZON JOCELYN [CA]);
 [X]US4900119  (HILL KENNETH O [CA], et al);
 [X]AU2488888  (BRITISH TELECOMM);
 [X]WO8805614  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]);
 [X]EP0234828  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]);
 [AP]US5740290  (BYRON KEVIN CHRISTOPHER [GB]);
 [AP]US5710849  (LITTLE BRENT [US], et al);
 [A]US5283686  (HUBER DAVID R [US]);
 [A]GB2295247  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]);
 [A]GB2254183  (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB])