Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003956

EP1003956 - ROTARY VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.06.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2005  [2005/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rovasco PTY Ltd (ACN 091 631 319)
Level 9, 162 Goulburn Street
Sydney NSW 2000 / AU
[2000/37]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Smith, Wayne
16 Caroline Chisholm Drive
South Camden, NSW 2570 / AU
For all designated states
Smith, Brian
16 Caroline Chisholm Drive
South Camden, NSW 2570 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Wayne
316 Forbes Road
Orange NSW 2800 / AU
02 / SMITH, Brian
5 Stephenson Street
Leumeah NSW 2560 / AU
[2000/37]
Former [2000/22]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Isenbruck, Günter , et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date98930560.203.07.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998AU00514
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0770704.07.1997         Original published format: AU PO770797
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901644
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003956
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU14.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:F01L7/16, F01L7/02
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/22]
TitleGerman:DREHVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2000/22]
English:ROTARY VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES[2000/22]
French:SOUPAPE ROTATIVE POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2000National basic fee paid 
04.02.2000Search fee paid 
04.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
01.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/31]
07.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[AP]DE29709846U  (WIPFLER HELMUT [DE]);
 [A]US5372104  (GRIFFIN BILL E [US]);
 [A]WO9411618  (BISHOP A E RES PTY LTD [AU], et al);
 [A]US5154147  (MUROKI TAKUMI [JP]);
 [A]GB2234300  (FRENCH COLIN RICHARD)
by applicantUS4019499
 US5052349
 US4852532
 WO9411618
 WO9711261