blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974112 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974112



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 248
20.03.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 1
05.12.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
02.06.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
17.08.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.06.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.06.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.02.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
10.02.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.05.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
11.05.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
07.05.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
03.03.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
28.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.03.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.03.2003 Annex Search / examination 12
12.03.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
12.03.2003 Description Search / examination 5
12.03.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 24
06.03.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
30.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
25.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
25.06.2002 Description Search / examination 2
25.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
24.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
15.04.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.04.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.12.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.12.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.05.2001 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.04.2001 General enquiry Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.12.1999 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
14.12.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.12.1999 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
04.12.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
20.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
20.10.1999 Description Search / examination 27
20.10.1999 Description Search / examination 11
20.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 6
20.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
01.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 22
17.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 4
08.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
08.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 38