blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974112


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.03.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]
01.12.2006 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.05.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
23.08.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.06.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.02.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.05.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.10.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.04.2003 Renewal fee
14.03.2003 Examination report or reply
12.03.2003 Examination report or reply
29.10.2002 Examination report or reply
02.07.2002 Examination report or reply
26.04.2002 Renewal fee
10.04.2002 Examination report or reply
14.12.2001 First examination report
11.12.2001 Examination report or reply
16.02.2001 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
11.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
03.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.11.1999 Renewal fee
29.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
29.10.1999 Amendment by applicant
27.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication