blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0974112
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2000515658Global Dossier 21.11.2000A
Priority number Date
DE9801019 08.04.1998
DE19714756 10.04.1997
DE19731043 19.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0974112Global Dossier 26.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE9801019 08.04.1998
DE19714756 10.04.1997
DE19731043 19.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19714756 13.11.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE19714756 10.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19731043 28.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19731043 19.07.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6557157 29.04.2003B1
Priority number Date
DE9801019 08.04.1998
DE19714756 10.04.1997
DE19731043 19.07.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9845794Global Dossier 15.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19714756 10.04.1997
DE19731043 19.07.1997