Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000066

EP1000066 - FUSED 1,2,4-THIADIAZINE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsværd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / NIELSEN, Flemming, Elmedlund
Fures Parkvej 46
DK-2830 Virum / DK
02 / HANSEN, John, Bondo
Langaasem 3
DK-4450 Jyderup / DK
03 / HANSEN, Holger, Claus
Annexg rdsparken 43
DK-3500 V rl se / DK
04 / TAGMOSE, Tina, M ller
Jonstrupvej 191
DK-2750 Ballerup / DK
05 / MOGENSEN, John, Patrick
Rorlokken 96
DK-2730 Herlev / DK
[2000/26]
Former [2000/20]01 / NIELSEN, Flemming, Elmedlund
Fures Parkvej 46
DK-2830 Virum / DK
02 / HANSEN, John, Bondo
Langaasem 3
DK-4450 Jyderup / DK
03 / HANSEN, Holger, Claus
Annexg rdsparken 43
DK-3500 V rl se / DK
04 / TAGMOSE, Tina, M ller
Farum Hovedgade 52, 204
DK-3520 Farum / DK
05 / MOGENSEN, John, Patrick
Dybendalsvej 69
DK-2720 Vanl se / DK
Application number, filing date98930653.530.06.1998
[2000/20]
WO1998DK00288
Priority number, dateDK1997000087216.07.1997         Original published format: DK 87297
DK1998000036817.03.1998         Original published format: DK 36898
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903861
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000066
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D513/04, A61K31/54
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
Extension statesLT16.02.2000
RO16.02.2000
SI16.02.2000
TitleGerman:KONDENSIERTE 1,2,4-THIADIAZINDERIVATE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG[2000/20]
English:FUSED 1,2,4-THIADIAZINE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE[2000/20]
French:DERIVES DE 1,2,4-THIADIAZINE FUSIONNEE, LEUR PREPARATION ET UTILISATION[2000/20]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2000National basic fee paid 
16.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
22.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/32]
08.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/32]
Request for further processing for:04.12.2002Request for further processing filed
04.12.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.12.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9726265  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]);
 [X]EP0618209  (ADIR [FR]);
 [X]GB1368948  (MANUF PROD PHARMA)
 [X]  - J. MED. CHEM., Volume 23, 1980, BAO-SHAN HUANG et al., "Synthesis and Properties of the Sulfonyl Analogues of 4(5)-Amino Imidazole-5(4)-Carboxamide, 4(5)-(Formylamino)Imidazole-5(4)-Carboxamid e, Guanine and Xanthinel", pages 575-577.,
 [X]  - J. MED. CHEM., Volume 36, 1993, BERNARD PIROTTE et al., "3-(Alkylamino)-4H-Pyrido(4,3-e)-1,2,4-Thia diazine 1,1-Dioxides as, Powerful Inhibitors of Insulin Release from Rat Pancreatic B-Cells: A New Class of Potassium Channel Openers?", pages 3211-3213.,
 [X]  - BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, Volume 47, No. 8, 1994, B. PIROTTE et al., "A Pyridothiadiazine (BPDZ 44) as a New and Potent Activator of ATP-Sensitive K+Channels", pages 1381-1386.,
 [X]  - METABOLISM, Volume 40, No. 8, 1991, WILLIAM D. VLAHOS et al., "Diabetes Prevention in BB Rats by Inhibition of Endogenous Insulin Secretion", pages 825-829.,