Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989909

EP0989909 - CATALYST OBTAINED FROM PHOSPHINOALKYL-FUNCTIONALIZED POLYSTYRENE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DELTA-LACTONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/14]CATALYST OBTAINED FROM PHOSPHINOALKYL-FUNCTIONALIZED POLYSTYRENE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF $g(d)-LACTONE
[2000/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2002
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.09.2002  [2002/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH
Weberstrasse 5
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / PITTER, Stephan
Landgrafenstieg 10
D-07743 Jena / DE
02 / DINJUS, Eckhard
Freiligrathstrasse 72a
D-07743 Jena / DE
03 / HOLZHEY, Nancy
Margarethenstrasse 9
D-07768 Kahla / DE
[2000/14]
Application number, filing date98930783.002.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998EP03290
Priority number, dateDE199712573518.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19725735
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9857745
Date:23.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989909
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989909
Date:19.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01J31/16, B01J31/22, C07C67/00
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2000/14]
TitleGerman:AUS PHOSPHINOALKYL-FUNKTIONALISIERTEM POLYSTYROL ERHÄLTLICHER KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DELTA-LACTON[2000/30]
English:CATALYST OBTAINED FROM PHOSPHINOALKYL-FUNCTIONALIZED POLYSTYRENE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DELTA-LACTONE[2000/30]
French:CATALYSEUR S'OBTENANT A PARTIR DE POLYSTYRENE A VALENCE FONCTIONNELLE PHOSPHINOALKYLE ET PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE DELTA-LACTONE[2000/30]
Former [2000/14]AUS PHOSPHINOALKYL-FUNKTIONALISIERTEM POLYSTYROL ERHÄLTLICHER KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON $g(d)-LACTON
Former [2000/14]CATALYST OBTAINED FROM PHOSPHINOALKYL-FUNCTIONALIZED POLYSTYRENE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF $g(d)-LACTONE
Former [2000/14]CATALYSEUR S'OBTENANT A PARTIR DE POLYSTYRENE A VALENCE FONCTIONNELLE PHOSPHINOALKYLE ET PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE $g(d)-LACTONE
Entry into regional phase07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
29.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2001Fee for grant paid
10.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.07.200104   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]US4506030  (JONES RICHARD A [US]);
 [A]WO9515815  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US])