Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034395

EP1034395 - CONTAINER, IN PARTICULAR FOR PRESSURISED LIQUEFIED GAS, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DJP Organisation
2, rue des Epinettes
94410 Saint Maurice / FR
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / MATTEI, Jean-Pierre
11 bis, rue Chevalier
F-94210 La Varenne Saint Hilaire / FR
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Pontet, Bernard
Pontet Allano & Associés
Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon
CS 70003 Saint Aubin
91192 Gif sur Yvette Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Pontet, Bernard
Pontet Allano & Associés s.e.l.a.r.l. 25, rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université
91893 Orsay Cedex / FR
Former [2005/50]Pontet, Bernard
Pontet Allano & Associés SELARL, 25, rue Jean-Rostand, Parc Club Orsay Université
91893 Orsay Cédex / FR
Former [2000/37]Thibon-Littaye, Annick
Cabinet A. THIBON-LITTAYE 11 rue de l'Etang
78160 Marly-le-Roi / FR
Application number, filing date98930851.512.06.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998FR01237
Priority number, dateFR1997000732413.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9707324
[2000/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9857095
Date:17.12.1998
Language:FR
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034395
Date:13.09.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034395
Date:03.01.2007
Language:FR
[2007/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:F17C1/16, B29C70/44, B29C70/26, F17C1/02, F17C13/12, B60K15/03
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTER FÜR FLÜSSIGGAS UNTER DRUCK UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2000/37]
English:CONTAINER, IN PARTICULAR FOR PRESSURISED LIQUEFIED GAS, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME[2000/37]
French:CONTENEUR, NOTAMMENT POUR RESERVOIR DE GAZ LIQUEFIE SOUS PRESSION, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2000National basic fee paid 
27.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
31.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2006Fee for grant paid
20.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
17.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
16.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.02.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.2000
23.02.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.2000
23.02.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.2000
23.02.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.2000
23.02.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   27.03.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
23.02.2000M01   Fee paid on   27.03.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB03.01.2007
IT03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
DE04.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
[2008/23]
Former [2008/16]GB03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
DE04.04.2007
ES14.04.2007
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5462193  (SCHOO RAUL A I [AR]) [Y] 1-4,11-13,15,19-22 * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]DE2723515  (SCHUETZ UDO KG) [Y] 1-4,11-13,15,19-22 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0633422  (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 16-18;
 [A]BE442554  (VERHOUSTRAETEN) [A] 16-18;
 [A]US3368708  (PFLEDERER FRED R);
 [PX]US5651474  (CALLAGHAN MICHAEL T [US], et al) [PX] 1,11,12,19-22 * figure -; claim - *