Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993478

EP0993478 - OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  17.12.2010
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2010Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 19.01.2011  [2011/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis Technology Oy
P.O. Box 330
06101 Porvoo / FI
[2011/03]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Borealis Technology Oy
P.O.Box 330
06101 Porvoo / FI
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
BOREALIS A/S
Lyngby Hovedgade 96
2800 Lyngby / DK
Inventor(s)01 / FOLLESTAD, Arild
Damstein 10
N-3960 Stathelle / NO
02 / SALMINEN, Hannu
Ruohikkopolku 6 E9
FIN-06400 Porvoo / FI
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Cockbain, Julian
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Cockbain, Julian, Dr.
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98930869.716.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998GB01747
Priority number, dateGB1997001266316.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9712663
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858001
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993478
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993478
Date:07.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0993478
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08F297/08, C08F10/00, C08F2/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
Extension statesAL14.01.2000
LT14.01.2000
LV14.01.2000
MK14.01.2000
RO14.01.2000
SI14.01.2000
TitleGerman:OLEFIN POLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN[2000/16]
English:OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION PROCESS[2000/16]
French:PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION D'OLEFINE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2000National basic fee paid 
14.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
07.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2004Fee for grant paid
27.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.01.2005  26.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
INEOS EUROPE LIMITED
Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines
Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB
Opponent's representative
Hawkins, David George, et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2007/34]
Opponent(s)01  06.01.2005  26.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
INEOS EUROPE LIMITED
Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines
Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB
Opponent's representative
Hawkins, David George, et al
Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey
Surrey, KT16 8LA / GB
Former [2006/47]
Opponent(s)01  06.01.2005  26.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Innovene Europe Limited
Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road
Staines, Middlesex, TW18 1DT / GB
Opponent's representative
Hawkins, David George, et al
Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey
Surrey, KT16 8LA / GB
Former [2006/40]
Opponent(s)01  06.01.2005  26.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Innovene Europe Limited
Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road
Staines, Middlesex, TW18 1DT / GB
Opponent's representative
Hawkins, David George, et al
Innovene Europe Limited, European Patents Group, Compass Point, 79-87 Kingston Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB
Former [2005/39]
Opponent(s)01  06.01.2005  26.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
BP Chemicals Ltd
Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus
GB-London EC2M 7BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Hawkins, David George, et al
Innovene Europe Limited, European Patents Group, Compass Point, 79-87 Kingston Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB
Former [2005/10]
Opponent(s)01  06.01.2005   
BP Chemicals Ltd
Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus
GB-London EC2M 7BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Hawkins, David George
BP International Limited Group Patents & Agreements Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
15.02.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.02.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
04.04.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.06.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.06.2007Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.09.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
01.12.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition07.08.2007Appeal received No.  T1357/07
09.10.2007Statement of grounds filed
10.06.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
10.06.2010Date of oral proceedings
21.06.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:03.05.2001Request for further processing filed
03.05.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
25.05.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.04.2004
CH07.04.2004
CY07.04.2004
FI07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
IE16.06.2004
LU16.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
DK07.07.2004
GR07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
PT07.09.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/17]AT07.04.2004
CH07.04.2004
CY07.04.2004
FI07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
IE16.06.2004
LU16.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
DK07.07.2004
GR07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
Former [2005/24]AT07.04.2004
CH07.04.2004
FI07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
IE16.06.2004
LU16.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
DK07.07.2004
GR07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
Former [2005/23]AT07.04.2004
CH07.04.2004
FI07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
LU16.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
DK07.07.2004
GR07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
Former [2005/18]AT07.04.2004
CH07.04.2004
FI07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
MC30.06.2004
DK07.07.2004
GR07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
Former [2005/11]AT07.04.2004
CH07.04.2004
FI07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
MC30.06.2004
GR07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
Former [2005/06]CH07.04.2004
FI07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
GR07.07.2004
SE07.07.2004
Former [2005/02]CH07.04.2004
FI07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
SE07.07.2004
Former [2004/52]CH07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
SE07.07.2004
Former [2004/51]CH07.04.2004
LI07.04.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0570051  (SOLVAY [BE]) [X] 1-49 * example 1; claim - *;
 [X]WO9703124  (BOREALIS POLYMERS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-49 * page 4, line 17 - page 9, line 26; claim - *;
 [X]WO9417112  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-49 * examples 4-7; claim - *;
 [A]WO9507942  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-49 * page 5 - page 6; claim - *;
 [A]US5276115  (BOHMER ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0398350  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 10-24,48,49 * claim - *
OppositionEP0881237
 WO9507942
 WO9634895
 EP0603935
 EP0770629