Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990016

EP0990016 - ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOUTH BANK UNIVERSITY ENTERPRISES LTD.
103 Borough Road
London SE1 0AA / GB
[2005/33]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
SOUTH BANK UNIVERSITY ENTERPRISES LIMITED
103 Borough Road
London SE1 0AA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / KATHIRGAMANATHAN, Poopathy
14 Sandhurst Avenue
North Harrow, Middlesex HA2 7AP / GB
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Lucas, Brian Ronald
Lucas & Co.
135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Lucas, Brian Ronald
Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road
Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
Application number, filing date98930877.017.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998GB01773
Priority number, dateGB1997001248317.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9712483
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858037
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990016
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990016
Date:17.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/06, H05B33/14
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROLUMINESZENZMATERIAL[2000/14]
English:ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIAL[2000/14]
French:MATERIAU ELECTROLUMINESCENT[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1999National basic fee paid 
30.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
12.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2005Fee for grant paid
01.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
11.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
16.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
CH17.08.2005
CY17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
LI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2006/26]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
CH17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
LI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/25]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
CH17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
LI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/14]AT17.08.2005
CH17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
LI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
SE17.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]US5128587  (SKOTHEIM TERJE [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * column 3, line 25 - line 53 *;
 [XA]EP0556005  (AMERSHAM INT PLC [GB]) [X] 26-29 * the whole document * [A] 1-25;
 [DXA]EP0744451  (AMERSHAM INT PLC [GB]) [DX] 26-29 * the whole document * [A] 1-25;
 [X]  - LIU LIN ET AL, "Europium complexes as emitters in organic electroluminescent devices", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTROLUMINESCENCE OF MOLECULAR MATERIALS AND RELATED PHENOMENA, FUKUOKA, JAPAN, 21-24 MAY 1997, ISSN 0379-6779, Synthetic Metals, Dec. 1997, Elsevier, Switzerland, vol. 91, no. 1-3, pages 267 - 269, XP002079652 [X] 1-29 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0379-6779(97)04029-0
 [X]  - DIRR S ET AL, "Luminescence enhancement in microcavity organic multilayer structures", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTROLUMINESCENCE OF MOLECULAR MATERIALS AND RELATED PHENOMENA, FUKUOKA, JAPAN, 21-24 MAY 1997, ISSN 0379-6779, Synthetic Metals, Dec. 1997, Elsevier, Switzerland, vol. 91, no. 1-3, pages 53 - 56, XP002079653 [X] 26-29 * figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0379-6779(98)80062-3
 [X]  - KIDO J ET AL, "White-light-emitting organic electroluminescent device using lanthanide complexes", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 2 (LETTERS), 15 MARCH 1996, PUBLICATION OFFICE, JAPANESE JOURNAL APPL. PHYS, JAPAN, ISSN 0021-4922, vol. 35, no. 3B, pages L394 - L396, XP002079654 [X] 26-29 * figure 1 *
 [DA]  - GREENHAM N C ET AL, "Measurement of absolute photoluminescence quantum efficiencies in conjugated polymers", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, 14 JULY 1995, NETHERLANDS, ISSN 0009-2614, vol. 241, no. 1-2, pages 89 - 96, XP002079651 [DA] 1-29 * page 89 - page 91 *