EP0998416 - DISPENSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pucka Creative Limited 25 Harley Street London W1 2BR / GB | [2001/35] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Finkletaub, Elaine le Atlantique CCA 16 Coleridge Road, Crouch End London N8 6ED / GB | ||
For all designated states Sanders, Sara 9a Woodcote Park Avenue, Purley Croydon, Surrey CR8 3ND / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finkletaub, Elaine 16 Coleridge Road, Crouch End London N8 8ED / GB | 02 /
Sanders, Sara 9a Woodcote Park Avenue, Purley Croydon, Surrey CR8 3ND / GB | [2001/35] |
Former [2000/19] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | JENSEN & SON 70 Paul Street London EC2A 4NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930938.0 | 24.06.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998GB01848 | Priority number, date | GB19970015401 | 23.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9715401 | GB19980000953 | 16.01.1998 Original published format: GB 9800953 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905047 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998416 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/04, A63F9/00 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
A63F11/0002 (EP);
B65D83/0481 (EP);
A63F9/0602 (EP);
A63F9/10 (EP);
A63F9/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Title | German: | AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2000/19] | English: | DISPENSING APPARATUS | [2000/19] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR | [2000/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/37] | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR1092506 (ETABLISSEMENTS MARIUS FICHET) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * figure - * [A] 14; | [XA]FR2677616 (BEURY MICHEL) [X] 1,2,5 * figure - * [A] 14; | [A]US4928970 (LATIMER JR RICHARD G) [A] 1 * figure - * |