EP0992144 - COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK END STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MADGE NETWORKS LIMITED Wexham Springs, Framewood Road Wexham, Slough SL3 6PJ / GB | [2000/50] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states MADGE NETWORKS LIMITED 100 Lodge Lane Chalfont St. Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4AH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIS, Trevor, Edward 9 Icknield Close, Wendover, Aylesbury Bucks HP22 6HG / GB | 02 /
BENHAM, Simon 4 Rokeby Close, Bracknell Berkshire RG12 2NA / GB | 03 /
ASTON, Christopher 40 The Crescent, High Wycombe Bucks HP13 6JR / GB | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2000/18] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2000/15] | Jennings, Guy Kenneth, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930953.9 | 26.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998GB01871 | Priority number, date | GB19970013539 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9713539 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900959 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0992144 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04Q11/04, G06F13/12 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP);
G06F13/128 (EP);
H04L49/90 (EP);
H04L9/40 (EP);
H04L2012/5616 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/15] | Title | German: | ENDSTATION IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2000/15] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK END STATION | [2000/15] | French: | STATION TERMINALE DE RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/02] | 07.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0236639 ; | [XA]US5450411 (HEIL THOMAS F [US]) [X] 1-3,6,11,14,15 * column 3, line 34 - line 67 * * column 6, line 21 - line 34 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 7 * [A] 4,12,13; | [A]US5544315 (LEHFELDT CARL R [US], et al) [A] 1,2,14,15 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 29 * * column 4, line 5 - column 6, line 52 * * "Especially col. 5 lines 25-31, col. 6, lines 35-42" * * column 10, line 22 - line 61 *; | [A]EP0762797 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5,7-10,15-18 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 52 * * figures 1,3-6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900416), vol. 014, no. 187, Database accession no. (E - 0917), & JP02036639 A 19900206 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] * abstract * |