Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003870

EP1003870 - A POLYNUCLEOTIDE FUNCTIONALLY CODING FOR THE LHP PROTEIN FROM MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS, ITS BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE DERIVATIVE FRAGMENTS, AS WELL AS METHODS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.10.2005  [2005/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSTITUT PASTEUR
25, rue du Docteur Roux
75015 Paris / FR
[2004/14]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
INSTITUT PASTEUR
25, rue du Docteur Roux
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Statens Serum Institut
Artillerivej 5
2300 Copenhagen 5 / DK
Inventor(s)01 / GICQUEL, Brigitte
8, rue Daguerre
F-75014 Paris / FR
02 / BERTHET, François-Xavier
86, rue Olivier de Serres
F-75015 Paris / FR
03 / ANDERSEN, Peter
Lystrupvej 7
DK-2700 Brönshöj / DK
04 / RASMUSSEN, Peter, Birk
Rudolph Bergsgade 5
DK-2100 Köbenhavn / DK
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98930967.916.07.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998IB01091
Priority number, dateUS19970052631P16.07.1997         Original published format: US 52631 P
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9904005
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003870
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/31, C07K14/35, C12N15/62, C07K19/00, C12N15/74, G01N33/53, C12N1/21, C07K16/12, A61K39/04, C12Q1/68, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:32, 1:19, 1:34, 1:38), C12R1:42
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:POLYNUKLEOTID, DAS FÜR DAS LHP PROTEIN AUS MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS KODIERT, DESSEN BIOLOGISCH AKTIVE FRAGMENTE, UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG[2000/22]
English:A POLYNUCLEOTIDE FUNCTIONALLY CODING FOR THE LHP PROTEIN FROM MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS, ITS BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE DERIVATIVE FRAGMENTS, AS WELL AS METHODS USING THE SAME[2000/22]
French:POLYNUCLEOTIDE CODANT FONCTIONELLEMENT POUR LA PROTEINE LHP DE MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS, FRAGMENTS DERIVES BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIFS, ET PROCEDES UTILISANT CE POLYNUCLEOTIDE[2000/30]
Former [2000/22]POLYNUCLEOTIDE CODANT FONCTIONELLEMENT POUR LA PROTEINE LHP DE $i(MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS), FRAGMENTS DERIVES BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIFS, ET PROCEDES UTILISANT CE POLYNUCLEOTIDE
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
02.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/43]
13.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
19.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO9709428  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [XD] 1-7,9-13,15-53 * abstract * * page 17, lines 4-22 * * page 18, lines 12-20 * * page 23, lines 7-24 * * page 37, line 12 - page 42 * * Seq.ID:46, 47, 88, 93-98, 112-119; page 83 - page 84 * * page 124 * * page 128 - page 131 * * page 143 - page 150 * * page 158 - page 163; claim - *;
 [XDA]WO9709429  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [XD] 1-7,9-13,15-53 * abstract * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 2 * * page 35, line 21 - page 36, line 13 * * page 39, line 22 - page 42 * * Seq.ID:46, 47, 89, 107-114; page 88 - page 89 * * page 135 - page 136 * * page 157 - page 164 * * page 173 - page 181; claim - * * figures 3-5 * [A] 54,55;
 [X]WO9625519  (PATHOGENESIS CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,9-12,15,34-43 * page 1, line 28 - page 4, line 31 * * page 11, lines 1-14; figures 1,4 * * page 37, line 13 - page 38, line 8 * * page 41 - page 44; claim - *;
 [PX]WO9816645  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [PX] 1-6,9,16,17,20,22,25,30-43 * abstract * * page 21, line 10 - page 28, line 17 * * Seq.ID:46, 47, 89, 107-114, 147, 148, 208, 209; page 90 * * page 141 - page 147 * * page 162 - page 166 * * page 218 - page 226 * * page 227 - page 236; claim - *;
 [PX]WO9816646  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [PX] 1-6,9,10,12,16,17,20-22,24,26-29,31,33 * abstract * * page 23, line 27 - page 29, line 7 * * page 41, line 12 - page 49, line 3 * * Seq.ID:46, 47, 88, 93-98, 112-119, 152, 153, 213, 214; page 88 - page 89 * * page 117 - page 118 * * page 121 - page 123 * * page 135 - page 141 * * page 154 - page 157 * * page 204 - page 211 * * page 212 - page 217; claim - *;
 [A]EP0400973  (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al) [A] 10-12,15 * column 5, lines 37-41 * * column 6, lines 6-11 *;
 [PX]  - Database EMBL R55U027, Entry AF004671 Accession number AF004671 29 June 1998 99% identity with Seq.ID:1, XP002081660 [PX] 1,2,4,5,17,20 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - TAM J.P., "Synthetic peptide vaccine design: synthesis and properties of a high-density multiple antigenic peptide system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (198808), vol. 85, pages 5409 - 5413, XP002070407 [AD] 18,19,23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.15.5409
 [AD]  - SATHISH M. ET AL., "Identification and characterization of antigenic determinants of Mycobacterium leprae that react with antibodies in sera of leprosy patients", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (199005), vol. 58, no. 5, pages 1327 - 1336, XP002081659