Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015367

EP1015367 - PROCESS FOR BONDING WEBS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CANFIELD, David Lee
R.R. 1, Box 197
Kingsley, PA 18826 / US
02 / HILL, Michael, Douglas
1 Forest Drive
Tunkhannock, PA 18657 / US
03 / LANGE, Stephen, Joseph
440 Reily Road
Wyoming, OH 45215 / US
04 / LYNCH, Ronald, James
4083 Rybolt Road
Cincinnati, OH 45248 / US
05 / MARSHALL, Paul, Jackson
R.R. 1, Box 112A
Tunkhannock, PA 18657 / US
06 / WHALEY, Mark, David
5365 Barkwood Drive
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
[2000/34]
Former [2000/27]01 / CANFIELD, David Lee
R.R. 1, Box 197
Kingsley, PA 18826 / US
02 / HILL, Michael, Douglas
R.R. 3, Box 3704, Concord Avenue 4
Factoryville, PA 18419 / US
03 / LANGE, Stephen, Joseph
440 Reily Road
Wyoming, OH 45215 / US
04 / LYNCH, Ronald, James
4083 Rybolt Road
Cincinnati, OH 45248 / US
05 / MARSHALL, Paul, Jackson
R.R. 1, Box 112A
Tunkhannock, PA 18657 / US
06 / WHALEY, Mark, David
5365 Barkwood Drive
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
Representative(s)Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2005/47]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2002/06]Nargolwalla, Cyra , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2000/27]Kohol, Sonia , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date98930975.220.07.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998IB01100
Priority number, dateUS1997089638318.07.1997         Original published format: US 896383
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903768
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015367
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015367
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/26]
Search report(s)International search reportEP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65H35/02, B65H21/00
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON FOLIEN[2000/27]
English:PROCESS FOR BONDING WEBS[2000/27]
French:PROCEDE DE LIAISON ENTRE NAPPES[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
02.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2005Fee for grant paid
02.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03079180.0  / EP1418144
EP05004417.1  / EP1561715
Opposition(s)30.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
IT29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
NL29.06.2005
CY20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
LU20.07.2005
DK29.09.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/26]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
NL29.06.2005
CY20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
LU20.07.2005
DK29.09.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
Former [2007/21]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
NL29.06.2005
CY20.07.2005
IE20.07.2005
LU29.08.2005
DK29.09.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
Former [2007/17]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
NL29.06.2005
IE20.07.2005
LU29.08.2005
DK29.09.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
Former [2006/36]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
NL29.06.2005
IE20.07.2005
DK29.09.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
Former [2006/35]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
NL29.06.2005
IE20.07.2005
DK29.09.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
DE30.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
Former [2006/26]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
NL29.06.2005
IE20.07.2005
DK29.09.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
Former [2006/25]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
NL29.06.2005
IE20.07.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
Former [2006/22]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
NL29.06.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
CH29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
LI29.06.2005
GR29.09.2005
SE29.09.2005
ES10.10.2005
PT07.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT29.06.2005
BE29.06.2005
FI29.06.2005
SE29.09.2005
Former [2005/52]FI29.06.2005
SE29.09.2005
Former [2005/50]SE29.09.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]US2698645  (HOWARD BATHON GEORGE, et al) [A] 1,4-7,10 * figure - *;
 [A]SU171541  (ZYRYANOV) [A] 1,4-7,10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2988134  (NISSEL FRANK R) [A] 1,4-7,10 * figure -; claim 2 *;
 [A]EP0769468  (TRANSPRINT USA [US]) [A] 1,4-7,10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2057029  (MCC JOHNSTONE ROBERT) [A] 1,4-7,10 * figure - *;
 [A]DE2729751  (BRAENDLE KLAUS) [A] 1,4-7 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4744845  (POSEY JOHN [US]) [A] 1,4-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0040264  (SIAT SPA [IT]) [A] 5 * figure 3 *;
 [X]US3172798  (KURT ROSENBAUM) [X] 8,10 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 46; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]FR1033958  (PORCHEZ) [X] 8,10 * page 1, column L, paragraph 5; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]FR1425934  (WINDMOLLER & HOLSCHER FA) [A] 8,10 * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]FR1244868  (L DOYEN) [A] 8 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]FR1516183  (MANUF DAUPHINOISE DE CONFECTIO) [A] 8 * figures 7-9 *;
 [X]DE856990  (PFAFF AG G M) [X] 9,10 * figure - *;
 [X]US3384527  (ALFRED FENER) [X] 9 * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US5232529  (MIYAKE TAKAO [JP]) [X] 9 * abstract *