Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989902

EP0989902 - METHOD FOR DESULFURIZING OFF-GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.11.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.12.2002  [2002/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stork Engineers & Contractors B.V.
Radarweg 60
1043 NT Amsterdam / NL
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / LAGAS, Jan, Adolf
Markgouw 4
NL-1141 JD Monnickendam / NL
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe , et al
Vereenigde, Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe , et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date98931121.215.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998NL00342
Priority number, dateNL1997100633917.06.1997         Original published format: NL 1006339
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9857731
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989902
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/52, B01D53/84, C01B17/05
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
Extension statesLT15.12.1999
RO15.12.1999
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSCHWEFELUNG VON ABGASEN[2002/04]
English:METHOD FOR DESULFURIZING OFF-GASES[2000/14]
French:DESULFURATION D'EFFLUENTS GAZEUX[2000/14]
Former [2000/14]VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSCHWEFELUNG VON ABGESEN
Entry into regional phase15.12.1999National basic fee paid 
15.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
30.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
15.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/51]
25.07.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9119558  (PACQUES BV [NL]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9210270  (PACQUES BV [NL]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9429227  (PACQUES BV [NL], et al) [A] 7 * the whole document *;
 [A]NL8801009  (RIJKSLANDBOUWUNIVERSITEIT) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5236677  (TORRES-CARDONA MARIO D [MX], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]EP0224889  (IMHAUSEN CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4499060  (RITTER HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]FR2331367  (COURTAULDS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *