Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009662

EP1009662 - CUSHIONING CONVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  22.02.2008
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 26.03.2008  [2008/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RANPAK CORP.
7990 Auburn Road Concord Township
Ohio 44077-972 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
Ranpak Corp.
7990 Auburn Road
Concord Township, Ohio 44077-972 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARMINGTON, Steven, E., Ranpak Corp.
7990 Auburn Road
Concord Township, OH 44077 / US
02 / RATZEL, Richard, O.
1751 Taylor's Mill Turn
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
03 / GUTH, Paul, J.
25020 Timbridge Lane
Beachwood, OH 44122 / US
04 / BOOZE, MacDonald, C.
106 Woodbridge Road
York, ME 03909 / US
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Powell, Timothy John
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Powell, Timothy John
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date98931211.111.06.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998US11598
Priority number, dateUS19970049346P11.06.1997         Original published format: US 49346 P
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856663
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009662
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65B61/22, B65B55/20
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:POLSTERUMWANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2000/25]
English:CUSHIONING CONVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2000/25]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRANSFORMATION POUR MATERIAU DE REMBOURRAGE[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2000National basic fee paid 
11.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
07.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2004Date of oral proceedings
25.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/13]
25.02.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.11.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/13]
Appeal following examination23.04.2004Appeal received No.  T1058/04
25.06.2004Statement of grounds filed
18.10.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
18.10.2007Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP04076723.8  / EP1555208
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200407   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2004
30.06.200508   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2005
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9513914  (RANPAK) [X] 1,2,26,36-38,45-47,66,68,92,103-105,112-114,155,157 * page 5, line 6 - page 9, line 19; figure 1 * [Y] 103-107,110,123-125,136,150-154,156,158,159,3-18,20-25,27-29,31,32,35,40,43,48-65,67,69-76,78-80,87,90,91,93;
 [Y]US4565048  (ROBERT BOSCH) [Y] 3-18,20-25,27-29,31,32,35,40,43,67,69-76,78-80,87,90,91,93,107,110,123,124,125,136 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 35; figures 1-6 *;
 [YA]US5311438  (ANDERSEN CONSULTING) [Y] 48-65 * column 70, line 30 - column 79, line 27 * * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 7 * [A] 19,77,94-102,126-132;
 [YA]US5105600  (EASTMAN KODAK) [Y] 103-106,150-154,156,158,159 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 17; figures 1-3 * [A] 30,41,42,44,108-114;
 [A]EP0115178  (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 10,23,81,115,133,142 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3709015  (FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG) [A] 30,41,42,44,108-114 * column 2, lines 34-63; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0517197  (KNAPP LOGISTIK AUTOMATION) [A] 137-140 * abstract *