Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989995

EP0989995 - TORSIN, TORSIN GENES, AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / OZELIUS, Lauri J. Massachussetts Gen.Hospital East
Molecular Neurogenetics Unit Buiding 149
13th Street Charlestown, MA 02129 / US
02 / BREAKFIELD, Xandra
127 Homer Street
Newton, MA 02159 / US
[2000/22]
Former [2000/14]01 / OZELIUS, Lauri J. Massachussetts Gen.Hospital East
Molecular Neurogenetics Unit Buiding 149
13th Street Charlestown, MA 02129 / US
02 / BREAKFIELD, Xandra
127 Horner Street
Newton, MA 02159 / US
Representative(s)Holdcroft, James Gerald , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr. , et al
Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Former [2000/14]Harvey, David Gareth , et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date98931393.719.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US12776
Priority number, dateUS19970050244P19.06.1997         Original published format: US 50244 P
US1998009945418.06.1998         Original published format: US 99454
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9857984
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0989995
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/00
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GR [2000/14]
TitleGerman:TORSIN, DAFÜR KODIERENDE GENE, UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN[2000/14]
English:TORSIN, TORSIN GENES, AND METHODS OF USE[2000/14]
French:TORSINE, GENES DE TORSINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2000National basic fee paid 
17.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
01.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/30]
10.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0398709  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 6,7,20 * abstract *;
 [XP]  - OZELIUS L.J. ET AL., "The early-onset torsion dystonia gene (DYT1) encodes an ATP-binding protein", NATURE GENETICS, (1997), vol. 17, pages 40 - 48, XP002086932 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0997-40
 [A]  - OZELIUS L.J. ET AL., "Fine mapping of the human dystonia gene (DTY1) on 9q34 and evaluation of a candidate cDNA", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, US, (199210), vol. 51, no. 4, suppl., XP002086933 [A] 1-11 * abstract *
 [AP]  - AUGOOD S. ET AL., "Expression of the early-onset torsion dystonia gene (DYT1) in human brain", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY, Hagerstown, US, (199805), vol. 43, no. 5, pages 669 - 673, XP002086934 [AP] 1,5-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.410430518