Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989996

EP0989996 - HUMAN PREPROTACHYKININ B [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
3174 Porter Drive
Palo Alto CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
3174 Porter Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HILLMAN, Jennifer, J.
230 Monroe Drive 12
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
02 / LAL, Preeti
2382 Lass Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
03 / KASER, Matthew, R.
4793 Ewing Road
Castro Valley, CA 94546-1017 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Wright, Simon Mark , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Wright, Simon Mark , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [2000/14]Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date98931422.419.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998US12855
Priority number, dateUS1997087999519.06.1997         Original published format: US 879995
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9857986
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0989996
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/00
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/14]
TitleGerman:MENSCHLICHE PREPROTACHYKININ B[2000/14]
English:HUMAN PREPROTACHYKININ B[2000/14]
French:PREPROTACHYKININE B HUMAINE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2000National basic fee paid 
07.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
24.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/29]
06.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/29]
12.07.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [ ] MCGREGOR ET AL: 'Neurokinin-immunoreactivity in human neuroblastomas' FEBS vol. 277, no. 1,2, December 1990, pages 83 - 87
International search[A]WO9104040  (BIOMEASURE INC [US]) [A] 17 * abstract *;
 [A]WO8707643  (RESEARCH CORP [GB]) [A] 18 * abstract * * page 1 - page 10 * * see examples *
 [Y]  - KOTANI H. ET AL, "Structure and gene organization of bovine neuromedin K precursor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 7074 - 7078, XP002076989 [Y] 1-3,9-13,19 * abstract * * figures 1,5 *
 [XY]  - HILLIER L. ET AL., "zh89a10.r1 Soares fetal liver spleen 1NFLS S1 Homo sapiens cDNA clone c428442 5' similar to SW:TKNK_ BOVIN NUEROKININ B PRECURSOR", EMBL DATABASE, HEIDELBERG, DE, (19960725), XP002085948 [X] 4-8 * AC: AA004764 * [Y] 1-3,9-13,19