Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994956

EP0994956 - MALE TISSUE-PREFERRED REGULATORY REGION AND METHOD OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): LU
published on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street
Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street
Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC.
800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street
Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALBERTSEN, Marc, C.
1930 S. 60th Street
West Des Moines, IA 50266 / US
02 / FOX, Timothy, W.
3833 Beaver
Des Moines, IA 50310 / US
03 / GARNAAT, Carl, W.
401 N.E. Innsbruck
Ankeny, IA / US
04 / HUFFMAN, Gary, A.
1431 41st Street
Des Moines, IA 50311 / US
05 / KENDALL, Timmy, L.
1275 Hogback Rodge Road
Earlham, IA 50072 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Bentham, Andrew , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/06]Bentham, Andrew , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/17]Goldin, Douglas Michael , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98931443.019.06.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US12895
Priority number, dateUS1997088049923.06.1997         Original published format: US 880499
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859061
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994956
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994956
Date:05.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/82, C12N15/29, C12N9/24, C12N9/22, C12N9/10, C12N9/00, C07K14/34, C12Q1/68, A01H5/00
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:REGULATORISCHE REGION, SPEZIFISCH FÜR MÄNNLICHE GEWEBE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN ANWENDUNG[2000/17]
English:MALE TISSUE-PREFERRED REGULATORY REGION AND METHOD OF USING SAME[2000/17]
French:REGION REGULANT DE PREFERENCE LES TISSUS MALES ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase12.01.2000National basic fee paid 
12.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
07.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2004Fee for grant paid
29.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE05.01.2005
FI05.01.2005
DK05.04.2005
SE05.04.2005
CY19.06.2005
LU19.06.2005
IE20.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
[2007/26]
Former [2007/21]BE05.01.2005
FI05.01.2005
DK05.04.2005
SE05.04.2005
CY19.06.2005
IE20.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2007/17]BE05.01.2005
FI05.01.2005
DK05.04.2005
SE05.04.2005
IE20.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2006/28]BE05.01.2005
FI05.01.2005
DK05.04.2005
SE05.04.2005
IE20.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
Former [2006/25]BE05.01.2005
FI05.01.2005
DK05.04.2005
SE05.04.2005
IE20.06.2005
Former [2006/12]BE05.01.2005
FI05.01.2005
DK05.04.2005
SE05.04.2005
Former [2005/51]BE05.01.2005
FI05.01.2005
SE05.04.2005
Former [2005/48]FI05.01.2005
SE05.04.2005
Former [2005/46]FI05.01.2005
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO9613588  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [AD] 1-34 * page 6,7,8,14,16,17; page 23 , line 5; Fig. 6 *;
 [A]WO9616182  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [A] 1-34 * pages 1-5,20-22,24,25,27,28; examples *;
 [AD]WO9529247  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [AD] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9617945  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [A] 1-34 * pages 1,6;page 35, line 10-15; examples 1,4,8 *;
 [A]WO9640925  (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0412911  (PLANT GENETIC SYSTEMS NV [BE]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *