Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992120

EP0992120 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA WITH INCREASED DATA RATES AND ROBUSTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2010
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.06.2010  [2010/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PROXIM, INC.
510 Deguigne Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
PROXIM, INC.
510 DeGuigne Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
MICRILOR, INC.
17 Lakeside Office Park
Wakefield, MA 01880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CAFARELLA, John, H.
53 Lincoln Circle
Swampscott, MA 01907 / US
02 / FISCHER, Jeffrey, H.
30 Emerson Place
Boston, MA 02114 / US
[2000/36]
Former [2000/15]01 / CAFARELLA, John, H.
53 Lincoln Circle
Swampscott, MA 01907 / US
02 / FISCHER, Jeffrey, H.
Apartment 14N, One Emerson Place
Boston, MA 02114 / US
Representative(s)Feldkamp, Rainer , et al
Garmischer Strasse 4
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Feldkamp, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Garmischer Strasse 4
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date98931447.122.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US12913
Priority number, dateUS19970050511P23.06.1997         Original published format: US 50511 P
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859428
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992120
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00
[2004/33]
Former International [2000/15]H04B1/69, H04L27/00, H04L27/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSES NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON DATEN MIT ERHÖHTER DATENRATE UND ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT[2000/15]
English:WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA WITH INCREASED DATA RATES AND ROBUSTNESS[2000/15]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL POUR TRANSMETTRE ET RECEVOIR DES DONNEES SELON UN DEBIT ET UNE RESISTANCE AMELIOREES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2000National basic fee paid 
24.01.2000Search fee paid 
24.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
27.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M11)
09.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/25]
04.02.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/25]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
14.03.2008Request for further processing filed
14.03.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.03.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200508   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.2005
30.06.200609   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2006
30.06.200912   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9522859  (MICRILOR INC [US]) [X] 1-45 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9217012  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-45 * page 5, line 16 - line 32; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5555268  (FATTOUCHE MICHEL [CA], et al) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *;
 [A]  FONG M-H ET AL, "LINE RATE(S) SELECTION FOR CELLULAR DS-CDMA SYSTEMS WITH INTEGRATED TRAFFIC", GLOBECOM '95. IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. SINGAPORE, NOV. 14 - 16, 1995, IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19951114), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-2510-9, pages 1809 - 1813, XP000633601 [A] 1-45 * the whole document *
 [A]  MO-HAN FONG ET AL, "CONCATENATED ORTHOGONAL/PN SPREADING SCHEME FOR CELLULAR DS-CDMA SYSTEMS WITH INREGRATED TRAFFIC", COMMUNICATIONS - GATEWAY TO GLOBALIZATION. PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. SEATTLE, JUNE 18 - 22, 1995, PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19950618), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-2487-0, pages 905 - 909, XP000533131 [A] 1-45 * the whole document *
International search[AP]US5745525  (HUNSINGER BILL J [US], et al);
 [A]US5029184  (ANDREN CARL F [US], et al);
 [A]US4403331  (HALPERN PETER H [US], et al);
 [A]US3697697  (AUDRETSCH LEO M JR, et al)