Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991408

EP0991408 - NOVEL PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING PAROXETINE SOLID DISPERSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): LU
published on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
223 Wilmington West Chester Pike
Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KRAPE, Philip, J.
702 Coniston Road
Wilmington, DE 19803 / US
02 / CHANG, Sou-chan
Apartment 81 45 Westwood Drive
Westbury, NY 11590 / US
03 / HEIN, William, A., II
252 Springfield Avenue
Hasbrouck Heights, NJ 07604 / US
04 / TELEHA, Christopher, A.
216 Rice Drive
Bear, DE 190701 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Breesé, Pierre
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Breese, Pierre
Breese - Majerowicz 3, avenue de l'Opéra
75001 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98931648.426.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US13350
Priority number, dateUS1997088506830.06.1997         Original published format: US 885068
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900131
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991408
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991408
Date:09.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/445
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:NEUES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG FESTER DISPERSIONEN ENTHALTEND PAROXETIN[2000/15]
English:NOVEL PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING PAROXETINE SOLID DISPERSIONS[2000/15]
French:NOUVEAU PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DISPERSIONS SOLIDES DE PAROXETINE[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2000National basic fee paid 
21.01.2000Search fee paid 
21.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
13.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2004Fee for grant paid
21.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
18.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
CY26.06.2005
LU26.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
[2007/26]
Former [2007/21]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
CY26.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2007/17]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
LU30.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/28]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
MC30.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/25]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
IE27.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
NL09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
GR09.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/12]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
CH09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
LI09.03.2005
DK09.06.2005
Former [2005/51]AT09.03.2005
BE09.03.2005
FI09.03.2005
Former [2005/46]FI09.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9515155  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM FARMA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-20,23-29 * page 1, lines 24-34 * * page 2, lines 15-21 *;
 [Y]WO9703670  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-20,23-29 * page 3, lines 5-20; examples 8-12 *;
 [Y]EP0125420  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM LTD [US]) [Y] 1-29 * page 2, lines 12-28 * * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 10 *;
 [Y]EP0580860  (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 21-29 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, column 54 *;
 [Y]WO9311749  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [Y] 21-29 * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 30 *
International search[Y]US4721723  (BARNES ROGER D [GB], et al);
 [X]WO9516448
 [X]  - DOUGHTY D G, PATHAK R D, PATHAK R, "Dry Formulation Process Improves Stability of Paroxetine Tablets - Useful in the Treatment of Depression, Neuroses, Etc.", DATABASE STN WPIDS, Database accession no. 95-263599, XP002913188