Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051201

EP1051201 - LABELS AND TRACKING SYSTEMS FOR STERILIZATION PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/14]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul
Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AMHOF, Anita
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / JAUSLIN, Urs
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
03 / IGNACIO, Ramon, T.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
04 / WEINIG, Florian
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
05 / STOOP, Christian
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2000/46]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98931696.324.06.1998
[2000/46]
WO1998US13463
Priority number, dateUS1998001944505.02.1998         Original published format: US 19445
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939754
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051201
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051201
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/26
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/46]
TitleGerman:ETIKETTEN UND ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR STERILISATIONSVERFAHREN[2000/46]
English:LABELS AND TRACKING SYSTEMS FOR STERILIZATION PROCEDURES[2000/46]
French:ETIQUETTES ET SYSTEMES DE POURSUITE POUR PROCEDURES DE STERILISATION[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase02.08.2000National basic fee paid 
02.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
21.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2006Fee for grant paid
28.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03014654.2  / EP1356830
Opposition(s)08.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4898762  (BROWN JOSEPHINE S [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * claims 1-4,7,8 * [Y] 2-5,7-20;
 [YD]DE9004818U  (VEREINIGTE PAPIERWARENFABRIKEN GMBH) [YD] 2-5,7-20 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5139957  (GRACK SCOTT J [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 30 - line 64 *