Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993636

EP0993636 - DOS BASED APPLICATION SUPPORTS FOR A CONTROLLERLESS MODEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/04]For all designated states
INTEL CORPORATION
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
INTEL CORPORATION
3065 Bower Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Cirrus Logic, Inc
3100 west Warren Avenue, MS-521
Fremont, CA 94538-6419 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BADER, James, E.
2321 Tamarack Court
Raleigh, NC 27612 / US
02 / DEANS, Scott
7309 Berkshire Downs
Raleigh, NC 27616 / US
03 / TARQUINI, Richard, P.
1010 E. Beechmont Circle
Apex, NC 27502 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date98931719.330.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998US13517
Priority number, dateUS1997088580030.06.1997         Original published format: US 885800
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900740
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993636
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993636
Date:13.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/10
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:DOS-ANWENDERPROGRAMMÜNTERSTÜTZUNGEN FÜR EIN MODEM OHNE STEUERUNG[2000/16]
English:DOS BASED APPLICATION SUPPORTS FOR A CONTROLLERLESS MODEM[2000/16]
French:SUPPORTS D'APPLICATIONS A BASE DOS POUR MODEM SANS CONTROLEUR[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
27.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2001Fee for grant paid
16.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200104   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.02.2002
BE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
GR13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
DK13.05.2002
PT13.05.2002
CY30.06.2002
LU30.06.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2004/10]AT13.02.2002
BE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
GR13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
DK13.05.2002
PT13.05.2002
CY30.06.2002
Former [2003/46]AT13.02.2002
BE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
GR13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
DK13.05.2002
PT13.05.2002
Former [2003/19]AT13.02.2002
BE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
GR13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
PT13.05.2002
Former [2003/09]AT13.02.2002
BE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
PT13.05.2002
Former [2003/06]BE13.02.2002
CH13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
PT13.05.2002
Former [2003/01]CH13.02.2002
LI13.02.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US5628030  (TUCKNER STEVEN A [US]) [X] 1-19 * column 1, line 65 - column 9, line 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0740253  (PCTEL INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 12; figure 2 *;
 [PX]EP0788057  (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [PX] 1-19 * page 4, line 6 - page 9, line 34; figures 1-5 *
 [A]  - R. L. GWINN, VMODEM TECHNICAL REFERENCE MANUAL, http://www.gwinn.com, (19960815), pages 1 - 19, XP002064677 [A] 1-19 * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 5 * * page 18 *