Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994801

EP0994801 - STEERABLE ENDOCARDIAL LEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.06.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERMEDICS INC.
4000 Technology Drive Angleton
Texas 77515 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
INTERMEDICS INC.
4000 Technology Drive
Angleton Texas 77515 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSTON, Matthew, M.
7350 Gallagher Drive, 137A Edina
Minnesota 55435 / US
02 / CONGER, Steven, R.
12053 Spade Spring Canyon Road
Agua Dulce, California 91350 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2000/27]01 / JOHNSTON, Matthew, M.
7350 Gallagher Drive, #137A Edina
Minnesota 55435 / US
02 / CONGER, Steven, R.
12053 Spade Spring Canyon Road
Agua Dulce, California 91350 / US
Former [2000/17]01 / JOHNSTON, Matthew, M.
Route 3, Box 118
Angleton, TX 77515 / US
02 / CONGER, Steven, R.
12053 Spade Spring Canyon Road
Agua Dulce, California 91350 / US
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98931790.402.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US13878
Priority number, dateUS1997089327915.07.1997         Original published format: US 893279
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903722
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994801
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B62K3/02, F16F9/06
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:STEUERBARE ENDOKARDIALE LEITUNG[2000/17]
English:STEERABLE ENDOCARDIAL LEAD[2000/17]
French:ELECTRODE ENDOCAVITAIRE ORIENTABLE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2000National basic fee paid 
04.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/32]
07.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0310295  (MCCOY WILLIAM C) [A] 1 * column 6, line 13 - column 9, line 30 *;
 [A]WO9703472  (ULLAKKO KARI MARTTI [FI]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 13 - line 24 * * page 4, line 3 - line 20 * * page 12, line 31 - page 14, line 16 *;
 [A]DE2743431  (REENSTIERNA ERIK GUSTAF BERTIL) [A] 1 * page 6, line 1 - line 11 *;
 [A]WO9427666  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19510250  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 8; figures 12-14 *