Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0978159 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0978159



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 264
08.06.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
28.08.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.09.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.07.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.07.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
03.07.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
20.04.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
10.04.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.03.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.03.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.03.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 48
05.12.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.12.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.11.2000 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
17.11.2000 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
29.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
26.08.1999 Description Search / examination 3
26.08.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
18.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 36
19.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 48
19.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 30
29.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
29.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 49