blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0978145


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.06.2008 Change - representative published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
02.05.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.06.2003  [2003/25]
09.05.2002 (Expected) grant published on  26.06.2002  [2002/26]
07.05.2002 Renewal fee
10.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.12.2001 Change - representative published on  13.02.2002  [2002/07]
18.12.2001 Communication of intention to grant
18.12.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.11.2001 Communication of intention to grant
20.09.2001 Examination report or reply
18.05.2001 First examination report
12.05.2001 Examination report or reply
03.05.2001 Renewal fee
28.07.2000 Change - applicant published on  13.09.2000 [2000/37]
28.07.2000 Change - representative published on  13.09.2000 [2000/37]
05.05.2000 Renewal fee
23.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.02.2000 [2000/06]
23.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  09.02.2000 [2000/06]
04.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication