blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0978145 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP98931894 EP98931895 EP98936165



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9859377Global Dossier 30.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19726678 24.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9849762Global Dossier 05.11.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE29801945 05.02.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002505038Global Dossier 12.02.2002A
Priority number Date
DE9801619 15.06.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001522528Global Dossier 13.11.2001A
Priority number Date
DE29801945 05.02.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
DE19717614 25.04.1997
DE9801029 09.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4307565BGlobal Dossier 05.08.2009B2
JP2001522529 13.11.2001A
Priority number Date
DE9801030 09.04.1998
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0992069Global Dossier 04.09.2002B1
EP0992069 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE9801619 15.06.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0978159Global Dossier 24.10.2001B1
EP0978159 09.02.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE29801945 05.02.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
DE19717614 25.04.1997
DE9801029 09.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0978145Global Dossier 26.06.2002B1
EP0978145 09.02.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE9801030 09.04.1998
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1253668 17.05.2000A
Priority number Date
DE29801945 05.02.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1258381 28.06.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19726678 24.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE19726678 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19726678 24.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE29801945U 18.06.1998U1
Priority number Date
DE29801945 05.02.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59801872D 29.11.2001D1
Priority number Date
DE29801945 05.02.1998
DE59801872 09.04.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
DE19717614 25.04.1997
DE9801029 09.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59804589D 01.08.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE9801030 09.04.1998
DE59804589 09.04.1998
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59805430D 10.10.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE9801619 15.06.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
DE59805430 15.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW407371B 01.10.2000B
Priority number Date
DE29801945 05.02.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6188555 13.02.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE29801945 05.02.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
DE19717614 25.04.1997
DE9801029 09.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6232625 15.05.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE9801619 15.06.1998
DE19726678 24.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6459108 01.10.2002B1
Priority number Date
DE9801030 09.04.1998
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9849733Global Dossier 05.11.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1253664 17.05.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19717614 25.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19717614 29.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19717614 25.04.1997