blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0978145

Designated contracting states CH 
 DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 LI 
 SE 
Examination procedure18.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase19.10.1999National basic fee paid 
19.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted26.06.2002
Opposition procedure27.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 18.06.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:09.02.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):CH DE FR GB IT LI SE
 
Event date:09.02.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991019
 
Event date:13.09.2000 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:SICED ELECTRONICS DEVELOPMENT GMBH & CO. KG
 
Event date:04.07.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010516
 
Event date:26.06.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):CH DE FR GB IT LI SE
 
Event date:26.06.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:28.06.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:28.06.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG
 
Event date:01.08.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59804589
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020801
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:14.08.2002 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20020721
 
Event date:20.12.2002 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:18.06.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030327
 
Event date:31.03.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PCAR
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE
Free Format Text:SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)
 
Event date:30.11.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20090409
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:29.12.2010 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20100409
 
Event date:31.12.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG
Free Format Text:SICED ELECTRONICS DEVELOPMENT GMBH & CO KG#PAUL-GOSSEN-STRASSE 100#91052 ERLANGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG#AM CAMPEON 1-12#85579 NEUBIBERG (DE)
 
Event date:11.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100409
 
Event date:22.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59804589 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SICED ELECTRONICS DEVELOPMENT GMBH & CO. KG, 91058 ERLANGEN, DE
Effective DATE:20110419
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20130418
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20130613
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20130422
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20130515
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20130423
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:01.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 59804589 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:02.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:23.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20141231
 
Event date:29.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 59804589 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20141101
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140410
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140430
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140430
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141101
 
Event date:27.02.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140430
 
Event date:31.03.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140409