Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978145

EP0978145 - SEMI-CONDUCTOR DEVICE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.05.2003
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SiCED Electronics Development GmbH & Co KG
Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100
91052 Erlangen / DE
[2002/26]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Siced Electronics Development GmbH & Co. Kg
Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100
91052 Erlangen / DE
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BARTSCH, Wolfgang
Rennesstrasse 21
D-91054 Erlangen / DE
02 / MITLEHNER, Heinz
Danzinger Strasse 1 a
D-91080 Uttenreuth / DE
03 / STEPHANI, Dietrich
Hans-Birkmayr-Strasse 7
D-91088 Bubenreuth / DE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Berg, Peter , et al
European Patent Attorney
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Berg, Peter , et al
European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2002/07]Berg, Peter , et al
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2000/37]Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. , et al
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 16 34
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date98931895.109.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998DE01030
Priority number, dateDE199711761425.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19717614
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9849733
Date:05.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978145
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978145
Date:26.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/86, H02H9/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:HALBLEITER STROMBEGRENZER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2000/06]
English:SEMI-CONDUCTOR DEVICE AND USE THEREOF[2000/06]
French:LIMITEUR DE COURANT A SEMICONDUCTEUR ET SON UTILISATION[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase19.10.1999National basic fee paid 
19.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
16.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2002Fee for grant paid
18.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9507548  (SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE9411601U  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR92860E  (TESZNER) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9619831  (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC N.V.) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PA]WO9723911  (SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [PA] 1-17 * the whole document *