Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977976

EP0977976 - CALORIMETER FOR FLUID FLOWS AND A METHOD FOR MONITORING THE AMOUNT OF HEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/06]CALORIMETER FOR FLUID FLOWS AND A DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE OPERATION OF THERMAL SOLAR INSTALLATIONS
[2000/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2002
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Böhringer, Volker
Haldenstrasse 42
75417 Mühlacker / DE
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Application number, filing date98931983.527.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998DE01133
Priority number, dateDE199711767126.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19717671
DE199713936709.09.1997         Original published format: DE 19739367
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9849532
Date:05.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977976
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977976
Date:18.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01K17/16, F24D19/10
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:WÄRMEMENGENMESSER FÜR FLUIDE STRÖMUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER WÄRMEMENGE[2000/33]
English:CALORIMETER FOR FLUID FLOWS AND A METHOD FOR MONITORING THE AMOUNT OF HEAT[2000/33]
French:CALORIMETRE POUR COURANTS FLUIDES ET METHODE POUR DETERMINER LA QUANTITE DE CHALEUR[2000/33]
Former [2000/06]WÄRMEMENGENMESSER FÜR FLUIDE STRÖMUNGEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER FUNKTION THERMISCHER SOLARANLAGEN
Former [2000/06]CALORIMETER FOR FLUID FLOWS AND A DEVICE FOR MONITORING THE OPERATION OF THERMAL SOLAR INSTALLATIONS
Former [2000/06]CALORIMETRE POUR COURANTS FLUIDES ET DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'INSTALLATIONS SOLAIRES THERMIQUES
Entry into regional phase04.10.1999National basic fee paid 
04.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
18.04.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
19.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
04.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.2000Fee for grant paid
28.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI18.07.2001
FR18.07.2001
GB18.07.2001
IE18.07.2001
IT18.07.2001
NL18.07.2001
DK18.10.2001
PT18.10.2001
SE18.10.2001
GR19.10.2001
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FI18.07.2001
FR18.07.2001
GB18.07.2001
IE18.07.2001
NL18.07.2001
DK18.10.2001
PT18.10.2001
SE18.10.2001
GR19.10.2001
Former [2005/01]FI18.07.2001
GB18.07.2001
IE18.07.2001
NL18.07.2001
DK18.10.2001
PT18.10.2001
SE18.10.2001
GR19.10.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2003/46]FI18.07.2001
GB18.07.2001
IE18.07.2001
NL18.07.2001
DK18.10.2001
PT18.10.2001
SE18.10.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2003/09]FI18.07.2001
GB18.07.2001
IE18.07.2001
NL18.07.2001
PT18.10.2001
SE18.10.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/48]FI18.07.2001
GB18.07.2001
IE18.07.2001
PT18.10.2001
SE18.10.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/27]FI18.07.2001
GB18.07.2001
PT18.10.2001
SE18.10.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/18]FI18.07.2001
GB18.07.2001
SE18.10.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/16]FI18.07.2001
GB18.07.2001
SE18.10.2001
Former [2002/15]FI18.07.2001
SE18.10.2001
Former [2002/05]SE18.10.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2836930  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4224825  (FELLER MURRAY F) [A] 1,2 * column A * * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 43 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 35; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4332164  (SCHLESINGER ROBERT J, et al) [A] 1,2 * column A * * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 12; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0676682  (MUELLER FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 1 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 51 * * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 30; figure 1 *