Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1018136 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1018136



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 442
05.11.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 39
08.12.1998 Priority document Search / examination 40
19.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.12.1999 Annex Search / examination 24
04.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 13
31.05.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.10.2000 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
24.08.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.08.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.12.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.12.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.01.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 26
27.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
27.02.2002 Description Search / examination 3
27.02.2002 Claims Search / examination 13
27.02.2002 Claims Search / examination 13
27.09.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.09.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
29.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 23
30.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
30.01.2003 Description Search / examination 3
30.01.2003 Description Search / examination 3
30.01.2003 Claims Search / examination 11
17.04.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.08.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.08.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.09.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
08.09.2003 Description Search / examination 23
08.09.2003 Description Search / examination 22
08.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 11
08.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 11
06.02.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 41
06.02.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
06.02.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.05.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
08.05.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 12
08.05.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.06.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.01.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.06.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.12.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1