blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1018136 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1018136



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 442
21.12.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
01.06.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.01.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.06.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.05.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.05.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
08.05.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 12
06.02.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.02.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
06.02.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 41
08.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 11
08.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 11
08.09.2003 Description Search / examination 23
08.09.2003 Description Search / examination 22
08.09.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
26.08.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.08.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.04.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.01.2003 Claims Search / examination 11
30.01.2003 Description Search / examination 3
30.01.2003 Description Search / examination 3
30.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
29.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 23
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
27.09.2002 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
27.09.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
27.09.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.02.2002 Claims Search / examination 13
27.02.2002 Claims Search / examination 13
27.02.2002 Description Search / examination 3
27.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
26.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 26
25.01.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.12.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.12.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.08.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
24.08.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.10.2000 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
31.05.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 13
04.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.12.1999 Annex Search / examination 24
03.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.12.1998 Priority document Search / examination 40
05.11.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 39