blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1018136


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.06.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.07.2005  [2005/29]
11.06.2004 (Expected) grant published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
18.05.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.05.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.01.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.01.2004 Change - German title published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
16.09.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.08.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.04.2003 Renewal fee
15.04.2003 Examination report or reply
05.02.2003 Examination report or reply
25.09.2002 Examination report or reply
07.05.2002 Renewal fee
04.03.2002 Examination report or reply
16.01.2002 Examination report or reply
24.08.2001 First examination report
21.08.2001 Examination report or reply
21.08.2001 Request for accelerated examination
14.08.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
04.05.2001 Renewal fee
17.10.2000 Request for accelerated examination
12.10.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
12.10.2000 Renewal fee
11.07.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
11.07.2000 Renewal fee
02.06.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
26.05.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.07.2000 [2000/28]
26.05.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.07.2000 [2000/28]
22.05.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
05.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
15.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
20.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication