blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1018136
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4232913BGlobal Dossier 04.03.2009B2
JP2001523379 20.11.2001A
Priority number Date
DE9801186 29.04.1998
DE19718799 03.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1018136Global Dossier 28.07.2004B1
EP1018136 12.07.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE9801186 29.04.1998
DE19718799 03.05.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59811722D 02.09.2004D1
Priority number Date
DE9801186 29.04.1998
DE19718799 03.05.1997
DE59811722 29.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6884992 26.04.2005B1
Priority number Date
DE9801186 29.04.1998
DE19718799 03.05.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9850938Global Dossier 29.04.1999A3
WO9850938 12.11.1998A2
Priority number Date
DE19718799 03.05.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19718799 05.11.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19718799 03.05.1997