blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1018136

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 NL 
Examination procedure08.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase03.12.1999National basic fee paid 
03.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2000
European patent granted28.07.2004
Opposition procedure29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit published on 13.07.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.07.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:12.07.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991203
 
Event date:10.10.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010824
 
Event date:28.07.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL
 
Event date:28.07.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:18.08.2004 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20040728
 
Event date:02.09.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59811722
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20040902
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:25.02.2005 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:20.07.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20050429
 
Event date:22.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:24.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20170424
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170425
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170427
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170424
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59811722 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:02.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20180428
 
Event date:23.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20180428
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180428