Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018136

EP1018136 - IMAGING AND/OR RASTER-MODE SCANNING SYSTEM PROVIDED WITH A DEVICE FOR COMPENSATING THE IMAGE DEGRADATIONS RESULTING FROM ENVIRONMENTAL FACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.07.2005  [2005/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heiland, Peter
Karl-Liebknecht-Strasse 30
65479 Raunheim / DE
[2000/28]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
PatentConsult
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date98932028.829.04.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998DE01186
Priority number, dateDE199711879903.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19718799
[2000/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9850938
Date:12.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1018136
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018136
Date:28.07.2004
Language:DE
[2004/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/02
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/28]
TitleGerman:ABBILDENDE UND/ODER ABTASTENDE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER KOMPENSIERUNG VON, DURCH DIE UMGEBUNG VERURSACHTER ABBILDUNGSVERSCHLECHTERUNGEN[2004/10]
English:IMAGING AND/OR RASTER-MODE SCANNING SYSTEM PROVIDED WITH A DEVICE FOR COMPENSATING THE IMAGE DEGRADATIONS RESULTING FROM ENVIRONMENTAL FACTORS[2000/28]
French:DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE ET/OU DE BALAYAGE LIGNE PAR LIGNE DOTE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DES DEGRADATIONS D'IMAGE DUES AUX FACTEURS ENVIRONNEMENTAUX[2000/28]
Former [2000/28]ABBILDENDE UND/ODER ABTASTENDE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER KOMPENSIERUNG VON, DURCH DIE UMGEBUNG VERUSACHTER ABBILDUNGSVERSCHLECHTERUNGEN
Entry into regional phase03.12.1999National basic fee paid 
03.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/28]
07.10.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
24.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
26.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2004Fee for grant paid
08.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH08321274  ;
 [X]JPS6452369  ;
 [A]WO9203840  (AMRAY INC [US]) [A] 1,38 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0579811  ;
 [A]JPH01286244  ;
 [A]JPH06162982
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 097, no. 004, [X] 1-5,8-10,19,20,22-24,26,38,39 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890613), vol. 013, no. 254, Database accession no. (E - 772), [X] 1,3-5,7-9,11,19,20,38 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930730), vol. 017, no. 412, Database accession no. (P - 1583), [A] 1,38 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900206), vol. 014, no. 065, Database accession no. (E - 0884), [A] 1,3,4,11-13,38 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940905), vol. 018, no. 475, Database accession no. (E - 1601), [A] 1,38 * abstract *