Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980320

EP0980320 - AUXILIARY GENERATOR SET WITH VARIABLE TRANSMISSION FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / KOELLE, Gerhard
Hofwiesenstrasse 22
D-75446 Wiernsheim / DE
02 / AHNER, Peter
Kirchheimer Strasse 18
D-71032 Böblingen / DE
03 / GLAUNING, Peter
In der Au 2
D-71711 Steinheim / DE
[2000/08]
Application number, filing date98932047.804.05.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998DE01215
Priority number, dateDE199711921309.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19719213
DE199714804530.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19748045
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851524
Date:19.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980320
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60K25/02, F02N11/04
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/08]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES NEBENAGGREGAT MIT VARIABLER GETRIEBEÜBERSETZUNG FÜR EINE KRAFTFAHRZEUG-BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2000/08]
English:AUXILIARY GENERATOR SET WITH VARIABLE TRANSMISSION FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2000/08]
French:GROUPE AUXILIAIRE ELECTRIQUE A TRANSMISSION VARIABLE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase09.12.1999National basic fee paid 
09.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
19.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/23]
05.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2172673  (SUNDSTRAND CORP) [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * * page 1, line 72 - page 2, line 62 * * figure 2 *;
 [XY]DE4118853  (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 16 - line 24 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 10;
 [XA]US5418400  (STOCKTON THOMAS R [US]) [X] 1-3,11 * abstract * * column 2, line 11 - line 56 * * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 30 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4-6,9,10,12;
 [X]DE3916979  (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 44 * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 4 * * figure 1 *;
 [XA]FR560401  (DUCELLIER ETS) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-6,9;
 [XA]EP0384808  (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-6,9;
 [Y]JPS63198556
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881215), vol. 012, no. 481, Database accession no. (E - 694), [Y] 10 * abstract *