Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992075

EP0992075 - FUEL CELL METHANOL REFORMER WITH AN ENERGY STORAGE UNIT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE ENERGY FLOW OF THE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2001
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.01.2002  [2002/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HAUER, Karl-Heinz
Nussbergerstrasse 9
D-38102 Braunschweig / DE
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date98932094.028.05.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998EP03154
Priority number, dateDE199712374606.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19723746
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856058
Date:10.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992075
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/04, H01M8/10
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/15]
TitleGerman:BRENNSTOFFZELLE-METHANOLREFORMER MIT EINEM ENERGIESPEICHER UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES ENERGIEFLUSSES DES SYSTEMS[2000/15]
English:FUEL CELL METHANOL REFORMER WITH AN ENERGY STORAGE UNIT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE ENERGY FLOW OF THE SYSTEM[2000/15]
French:REFORMEUR DE METHANOL A PILE A COMBUSTIBLE AVEC RESERVOIR D'ENERGIE ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DU FLUX D'ENERGIE DU SYSTEME[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2000National basic fee paid 
07.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
03.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5631532  (AZUMA RYUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7-11 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 67 * * column 8, lines 28-49 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 11 * * figure - * [Y] 4-6;
 [XY]EP0334474  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 19 * * figure 1 * [Y] 4-7;
 [XY]US4904548  (TAJIMA HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * column 5, lines 25-39 * * column 6, lines 38-59 * * column 8, lines 57-62 * [Y] 4-7;
 [XY]US4839574  (TAKABAYASHI YASUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 15 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 2 * [Y] 5-8;
 [X]US5154986  (TAKECHI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, lines 1-24 *;
 [Y]JPH02168803  ;
 [Y]JPS63236269  ;
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900914), vol. 014, no. 428, Database accession no. (M - 1025), & JP02168803 A 19900628 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [Y] 1,2,5,8,9 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890127), vol. 013, no. 038, Database accession no. (E - 709), & JP63236269 A 19881003 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - NADAL M ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF A HYBRID FUEL CELL/BATTERY POWERED ELECTRIC VEHICLE", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, (19960601), vol. 21, no. 6, pages 497 - 505, XP000587909 [A] 8-11 * page 501 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0360-3199(95)00102-6